Personal Details
Name in Home Country / Full Name: | Radmilo Ivančević |
---|---|
Date of birth/Age: | Sep 4, 1950 (73) |
Place of Birth: | Gornji Milanovac |
Citizenship: | Serbia |
Avg. term as coach: | 0.80 Years |
Stats
No information available.
History
This is an overview of the career of a manager.
wappen | Club & role | Appointed | In charge until | Matches | PPM | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zvijezda 09 Advisor | 20/21 (Jul 25, 2020) | 20/21 (Sep 10, 2020) | - | 0.00 | ||
Serbia U21 Assistant Manager | 16/17 (Jul 1, 2016) | expected - | - | 0.00 | ||
Novi Pazar Manager | 15/16 (Oct 30, 2015) | 15/16 (Jan 9, 2016) | 6 | 0.67 | ||
Pafos FC Manager | 14/15 (Jul 1, 2014) | 14/15 (Oct 14, 2014) | - | 0.00 | ||
Radnicki 1923 Manager | 13/14 (Jul 1, 2013) | 13/14 (Mar 13, 2014) | 20 | 1.05 | ||
Alki Larnaca Manager | 10/11 (May 14, 2011) | 11/12 (Jul 30, 2011) | - | 0.00 | ||
A. Geroskipou Manager | 10/11 (Jul 1, 2010) | 10/11 (Dec 31, 2010) | - | 0.00 | ||
Alki Larnaca Manager | 09/10 (Jul 1, 2009) | 09/10 (Mar 21, 2010) | - | 0.00 | ||
Kuwait SC Manager | 07/08 (Jun 16, 2008) | 08/09 (Jun 30, 2009) | - | 0.00 | ||
Smederevo 1924 Manager | 07/08 (Nov 8, 2007) | 07/08 (Jun 28, 2008) | 21 | 1.19 | ||
Makedonija Manager | 06/07 (Jul 1, 2006) | 06/07 (Jun 30, 2007) | 1 | 1.00 | ||
Rad Manager | 04/05 (Jul 1, 2004) | 04/05 (Jun 30, 2005) | - | 0.00 | ||
FK Obilic Manager | 03/04 (Jul 1, 2003) | 03/04 (Jun 30, 2004) | - | 0.00 | ||
AE Pafos Manager | 02/03 (Jan 1, 2003) | 02/03 (Jun 30, 2003) | - | 0.00 | ||
C'dole Sapporo Manager | 01/02 (Jun 1, 2002) | 02/03 (Sep 16, 2002) | 11 | 0.36 | ||
OFK Beograd Manager | 99/00 (Jan 1, 2000) | 99/00 (Jun 30, 2000) | - | 0.00 | ||
AEK Larnaca Manager | 99/00 (Jul 1, 1999) | 99/00 (Dec 30, 1999) | - | 0.00 | ||
Radnicki Nis Manager | 98/99 (Sep 5, 1998) | 98/99 (Jun 30, 1999) | - | 0.00 | ||
Sakaryaspor Manager | 98/99 (Jul 16, 1998) | 98/99 (Sep 3, 1998) | 4 | 0.25 | ||
Atlético Madrid Assistant Manager | 95/96 (Jul 1, 1995) | 97/98 (Jun 30, 1998) | - | 0.00 | ||
Radnicki 1923 Manager | 93/94 (Jul 1, 1993) | 93/94 (Jun 30, 1994) | - | 0.00 | ||
Real Oviedo Assistant Manager | 93/94 (Jul 1, 1993) | 94/95 (Jun 30, 1995) | - | 0.00 | ||
Kuwait Olympic Assistant Manager | 91/92 (Jul 1, 1991) | 92/93 (Jun 30, 1993) | - | 0.00 | ||
Partizan Assistant Manager | 90/91 (Jul 1, 1990) | 90/91 (Jun 30, 1991) | - | 0.00 | ||
Kuwait Assistant Manager | 88/89 (Jul 1, 1988) | 88/89 (Jun 30, 1989) | - | 0.00 | ||
Kazma SC Manager | 84/85 (Jul 1, 1984) | 87/88 (Jun 30, 1988) | - | 0.00 | ||
Sumadija AR Manager | 83/84 (Jul 1, 1983) | 83/84 (Jun 30, 1984) | - | 0.00 |
Transfer history as a player
This page displays all transfers for the selected player. Alongside the date of the transfer, the clubs involved and the transfer fee, it also displays the market value of the player at the time of the transfer.
ncG1vNJzZmivp6x7tb7Ap6qfnaKirrO302eaqKVfp66lucilpmahppa7pLHVoppoqKKks6q4jq2pmqGemr9wgZNvcA%3D%3D